Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016676

EP1016676 - A catalyst system for the preparation of polyethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zoeckler, Mary Therese
141 Center St.
Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US
02 / Schramm, Kathleen Dahl
93 Beechwood Circle
Neshanic, New Jersey 08853 / US
03 / Smale, Mark Wilton
5A Maudy Drive
Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date99308944.010.11.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998019573619.11.1998         Original published format: US 195736
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1016676
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1016676
Date:24.01.2001
[2001/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/64, C08F10/02
[2001/04]
Former International [2000/27]C08F4/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/41]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Katalysatorsystem zur Herstellung von Polyethylen[2000/27]
English:A catalyst system for the preparation of polyethylene[2000/27]
French:Système catalytique pour la préparation de polyéthylène[2000/27]
Examination procedure17.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
25.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
11.09.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9844010  (TOYO STAUFFER CHEM CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0915104  (TOYO STAUFFER CHEM CO [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3954668  (YOO JIN SUN, et al) [A] 2,3,7-9,11 * the whole document *
 [X]  SOGA K ET AL, "PROPENE POLYMERIZATION WITH THE MGCL2-SUPPORTED DICHLOROBIS(SS-DIKETONATO)TITANIUM CATALYSTS ACTIVATED BY ORDINARY ALKYLALUMINUMS", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION,US,JOHN WILEY AND SONS. NEW YORK, (19980115), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 0887-624X, pages 129 - 135, XP000907088 [X] 1-12 * the whole document *