Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006384

EP1006384 - Optical fibre cable manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prysmian Cables & Systems Limited
Chickenhall Lane Eastleigh
Hampshire SO50 6YU / GB
[2007/43]
Former [2004/29]For all designated states
Pirelli General plc
15 Grosvenor Street
London W1K 4QZ / GB
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
PIRELLI GENERAL plc
11 Berkeley Street
London W1X 6BU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Fishlock, Nigel Earl
79 Mary Street, Cilfynydd
Pontypridd, South Wales CF37 4ES / GB
02 / Shackleton, Nigel
8 Ty Pwca Place, West Pontnewydd
Cwmbran, Newport, South Wales NP44 1SR / GB
03 / Brown, Anthony
12 Priory Avenue, Ewenny
Bridgend, South Wales CF31 3LR / GB
 [2008/16]
Former [2000/23]01 / Fishlock, Nigel Earl
79 Mary Street, Cilfynydd
Pontypridd, South Wales CF37 4ES / GB
02 / Shackleton, Nigel
Ty Pwca Place, West Pontnewydd
Cwmbran, Newport, South Wales NP44 1SR / GB
03 / Brown, Anthony
12 Priory Avenue, Ewenny
Bridgend, South Wales CF31 3LR / GB
Representative(s)Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/08]Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2000/23]Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99308984.611.11.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateGB1998002626330.11.1998         Original published format: GB 9826263
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1006384
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006384
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/23]
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für optische Kabel[2000/23]
English:Optical fibre cable manufacture[2000/23]
French:Procédé de fabrication pour des cables optiques[2000/23]
Examination procedure06.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
23.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
04.03.2008Fee for grant paid
04.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
04.03.2008Request for further processing filed
04.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.03.2008Decision despatched
17.06.2005Request for further processing filed
17.06.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.07.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
IE11.11.2008
LU11.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
IE11.11.2008
LU11.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/06]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
IE11.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/30]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/14]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
Former [2009/08]AT16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
Former [2009/07]AT16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
ES27.07.2008
PT16.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES27.07.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2172410  (TELEPHONE CABLES LTD) [X] 1,2,9,11-13 * figure -; claim - *