Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002708

EP1002708 - Vehicle parking brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2001/06]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
ROVER GROUP LIMITED
International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park
Warwick, Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Basnett, Michael Neil
51 Darren View
Crickhowell, Powys NP8 1DS / GB
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Günter H. H. , et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Patentabteilung AJ-5
80788 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Schmidt, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3
80788 München / DE
Former [2000/21]Wilson, Alan Stuart , et al
Rover Group Limited, Patent Department, Gaydon Test Centre, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Application number, filing date99309023.212.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateGB1998002508217.11.1998         Original published format: GB 9825082
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002708
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T7/10
[2000/21]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/06]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Feststellbremsen für Kraftfahrzeuge[2000/21]
English:Vehicle parking brakes[2000/21]
French:Freins de stationnement pour véhicules[2000/21]
Examination procedure25.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/33]
07.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/33]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB715787  (RANSOMES & RAPIER LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 113 - page 3, line 59; figure 2 *;
 [DA]GB2301657  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 25; figure 1 *