blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002822

EP1002822 - Preparation of organopolysiloxane gum [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/34]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shibata, Keiji, c/o Gunma Complex
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Tawara, Kenji, c/o Gunma Complex
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2000/21]Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99309032.312.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateJP1998032343713.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32343798
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002822
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002822
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:C08G77/06, C08G77/10
[2000/21]
CPC:
C08G77/20 (EP,US); C08G77/06 (EP,US); C08G77/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/06]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung vom Polyorganosiloxangummi[2000/21]
English:Preparation of organopolysiloxane gum[2000/21]
French:Procédé de préparation d'une gomme de oganopolysiloxane[2000/21]
Examination procedure07.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
21.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2005Fee for grant paid
29.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2883366  (KANTOR SIMON W, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 5, lines 50-63; example 7 *;
 [ADX]US4439592  (MAASS GUENTHER [DE], et al) [AD] 1-5 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 22; example - *[X] 5;
 [Y]US4482670  (SAAM JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 8, lines 39-59 *;
 [YX]US4780519  (SAAM JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 5, line 7; example - * [X] 5;
 [Y]US5089450  (WATANUKI ISAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 58; example 2 *;
 [YX]EP0515081  (DOW CORNING [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, line 18 - page 5, line 45; figure 1; example - * [X] 5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.