Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001582

EP1001582 - System for network transcoding of multimedia data flow [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2008
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tut Systems, Inc.
6000 S.W. Meadows Road, Suite 200
Lake Oswego, Oregon 97035 / US
[2007/49]
Former [2004/30]For all designated states
Tut Systems, Inc.
6000 S.W. Meadows Road, Suite 200
Lake Oswego, Oregon 97035 / US
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
VideoTele.com, Inc.
6000 S.W. Meadows Road, Suite 200
Lake Oswego, Oregon 97035 / US
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
TEKTRONIX, INC.
Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue
Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Neogi, Raja
15797 N.W. Andalusian Way
Portland, Oregon 97229 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Molyneaux, Martyn William , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote
40- 43 Chancery Lane
London
WC2A 1JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Molyneaux, Martyn William , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2001/45]Molyneaux, Martyn William , et al
Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn
London WC2A 2AZ / GB
Former [2000/20]Molyneaux, Martyn William
Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6RR / GB
Application number, filing date99309035.612.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998019192913.11.1998         Original published format: US 191929
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001582
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001582
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001582
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/64, H04L12/66
[2000/45]
Former International [2000/20]H04L29/06, H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2001/31]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur Netztranskodierung von Multimediendatenfluss[2000/20]
English:System for network transcoding of multimedia data flow[2000/20]
French:Système de transcodage au réseau de flux de données multimédias[2000/20]
Examination procedure30.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
16.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
18.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2007Fee for grant paid
24.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
17.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
17.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9843177  (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 29 * * page 11, line 2 - page 13, line 19 * * page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 6 * * page 19, line 13 - line 27; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]  AMIR ELAN ; MCCANNE STEVEN ; KATZ RANDY, "Active service framework and its application to real-time multimedia transcoding", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 CONFERENCE ON APPLICATIONS, TECHNOLOGIES, ARCHITECTURES, AND PROTOCOLS FOR COMPUTER COMMUNICATION, ACM SIGCOMM'98; VANCOUVER, CANADA, (19980831), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 178 - 188, XP002147572 [A] 1,4,7 * page 178, column R, line 1 - page 180, column L, line 44 * * page 181, column L, paragraph 2.3.1 - page 182, column R, line 12 * * page 186, column R, paragraph 3.3 *
 [A]  SHARMA ROSEN ; KESHAV S ; WU MICHAEL ; WU LINDA, "Environments for active networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 7TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON NETWORK AND OPERATING SYSTEM SUPPORT FOR DIGITAL AUDIO AND VIDEO, St.Louis, MO, USA, (19970519), pages 77 - 84, XP002147575 [A] 1,4,7 * abstract * * page 78, column L, line 1 - line 24 * * page 78, column R, paragraph 2.1 *