Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002689

EP1002689 - A control device and a control method for a hybrid vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2011
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.02.2011  [2011/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
[2010/09]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nitta, Tomoaki
c/o Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
02 / Jinbo, Yoshitaka
c/o Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
 [2009/42]
Former [2000/21]01 / Nitta, Tomoaki
Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 1-7-2 Nishishinjuku
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
02 / Jinbo, Yoshitaka
Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 1-7-2 Nishishinjuku
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
Representative(s)Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Brookes Batchellor
102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Former [2000/21]BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO.
102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date99309170.118.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateJP1998032864018.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32864098
JP1998032864118.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32864198
JP1998032864218.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32864298
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002689
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002689
Date:24.07.2002
[2002/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002689
Date:03.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60K6/442, B60K6/543, B60W10/02, B60W10/08, B60W10/10, B60W20/00
[2009/45]
Former International [2002/30]B60L11/12, B60K6/04, B60K41/00
Former International [2000/21]B60L11/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/16]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regelvorrichtung und Regelverfahren für ein Hybrid-Fahrzeug[2000/21]
English:A control device and a control method for a hybrid vehicle[2000/21]
French:Dispositif de réglage et méthode de réglage pour un véhicule hybride[2009/42]
Former [2000/21]Dispositif de règlage et méthode de règlage pour une vehicule hybride
Examination procedure22.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
06.10.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2009
01.07.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.07.2009Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2010Fee for grant paid
20.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US5791427  (YAMAGUCHI KOZO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0898322
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08098322 A 19960412 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract *
by applicantUS5791427
 JPH0898322