blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1002560 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1002560



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 358
03.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
24.11.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.12.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.12.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
11.12.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
11.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.12.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
22.10.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.10.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.10.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.10.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
12.06.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
05.06.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
31.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
31.05.2007 Description Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Description Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.04.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.03.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
28.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
07.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2006 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
01.08.2006 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
01.08.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
08.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
08.08.2005 Description Search / examination 3
08.08.2005 Description Search / examination 4
08.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
05.08.2005 Description Search / examination 3
05.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.04.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2004 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2004 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
14.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
14.09.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.04.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.06.2001 Request for change of address Search / examination 4
25.06.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
19.02.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
11.05.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.05.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 55
12.04.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
18.11.1999 Description Search / examination 26
18.11.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 19
18.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 52
18.11.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6