blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1002560


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.11.2010 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.12.2010  [2010/52]
18.12.2009 (Expected) grant published on  20.01.2010  [2010/03]
18.12.2009 Change - representative published on  20.01.2010  [2010/03]
17.12.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.12.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.11.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.06.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.03.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.12.2006 First examination report
05.12.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.08.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.04.2005 First examination report
01.04.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2003 Change - extension states
20.11.2002 Renewal fee
15.11.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
27.09.2002 Request for examination filed published on  13.11.2002  [2002/46]
15.02.2002 Publication of search report published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
15.02.2002 Change - classification published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
16.11.2001 Renewal fee
06.07.2001 Change - applicant published on  22.08.2001 [2001/34]
16.02.2001 Change - representative published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
07.04.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.05.2000 [2000/21]