blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1002560

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure11.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
04.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted20.01.2010
Opposition procedure21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit published on 22.12.2010 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:24.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.05.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:22.08.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NINTENDO CO., LIMITED
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7A 63F 13/00 A, 7A 63F 13/06 B, 7A 63F 13/10 B
 
Event date:13.11.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020914
 
Event date:02.01.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:25.05.2005 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050406
 
Event date:10.01.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20050406
 
Event date:20.01.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:20.01.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:11.03.2010 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69941944
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20100311
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.12.2010 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20101021
 
Event date:08.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:14.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:12.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:11.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181106
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20181011
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181114
Year of Fee Payment:20