Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002560

EP1002560 - Video game apparatus and information storage medium for video game [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.12.2010  [2010/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NINTENDO CO., LTD.
11-1, Hokotate-cho
Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto 601 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Ltd.
11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku
Kyoto 601 / JP
Former [2001/34]For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Limited
11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba
Minami-ku, Kyoto 601 / JP
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
NINTENDO CO. LIMITED
60, Fukuine Kamitakamatsu-cho
Higashiyama-ku Kyoto / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawagoe, Takumi, c/o Nintendo Co. Ltd.
60, Fukuine Kamitakamatsu-cho, Higashiyama-ku
Kyoto / JP
02 / Yamada, Yoichi, c/o Nintendo Co. Ltd.
60, Fukuine Kamitakamatsu-cho, Higashiyama-ku
Kyoto / JP
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Perkins, Sarah , et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Perkins, Sarah , et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London
EC4A 3BG / GB
Former [2001/14]Perkins, Sarah , et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
Former [2000/21]Wilkinson, Stephen John , et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date99309193.318.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateJP1998032980719.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32980798
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002560
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002560
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002560
Date:20.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/00, A63F13/06, A63F13/10
[2002/14]
Former International [2000/21]A63F13/00, A63F13/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/01]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Videospielvorrichtung und Videospielspeichermedium[2000/21]
English:Video game apparatus and information storage medium for video game[2000/21]
French:Appareil de jeu vidéo et support d'enregistrement pour jeu vidéo[2000/21]
Examination procedure14.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
06.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2009Fee for grant paid
11.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
04.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
03.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9835734  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 [Y] 4,9;
 []EP0901803  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0144] *;
 [Y]US5769718  (RIEDER WILLIAM R [US]) [Y] 4,9 * column 8, line 24 - line 36 *;
 [A]EP0801363  (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4,9 * abstract * * page 9, line 5 - line 10 *
ExaminationEP0841640