Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035560

EP1035560 - Rotatable workpiece support including cylindrical workpiece support surfaces for an ion beam implanter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.01.2006  [2006/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axcelis Technologies, Inc.
55 Cherry Hill Drive
Beverly, MA 01915-1053 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Axcelis Technologies, Inc.
55 Cherry Hill Drive
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mack, Michael Edward
7 Hidden Ledge Road
Manchester, Massachusetts 01944 / US
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99309207.118.11.1999
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateUS1998019708319.11.1998         Original published format: US 197083
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035560
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/317, H01J37/20, H01L21/265, H01L21/68
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehbare Werkstückhalterung mit zylindrischen Werkstückauflageflächen für eine Ionenimplantationsvorrichtung[2000/37]
English:Rotatable workpiece support including cylindrical workpiece support surfaces for an ion beam implanter[2000/37]
French:Dispositif de support rotatif de pièce à usiner avec des surfaces de support cylindriques pour un dispositif à l'implantation d'ions[2000/37]
Examination procedure28.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
09.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/04]
25.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0724284  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,8,12,18 * ABSTRACT;; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO8802920  (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [A] 1,8,12,18 * ABSTRACT; page 14, line 4 - page 18, line 21; figures 2-5 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0458422  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US])