Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010926

EP1010926 - Seal assembly for an intershaft seal in a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.06.2006  [2006/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sheridan, William G.
123 Gwen Road, P.O. Box 988
Southington, CT 06489 / US
02 / Shaffer, Harold K.
34 Eastview Terrace
Tolland, CT 06084 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Leckey, David Herbert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99309231.119.11.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateUS1998021368617.12.1998         Original published format: US 213686
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1010926
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1010926
Date:03.07.2002
[2002/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010926
Date:20.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/34
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/13]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zwischenwellen-Dichtungsanordnung für ein Gasturbinentriebwerk[2000/25]
English:Seal assembly for an intershaft seal in a gas turbine engine[2000/25]
French:Dispositif d'étanchéité inter-arbres pour turbine à gaz[2000/25]
Examination procedure22.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
22.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2005Fee for grant paid
12.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Request for further processing for:11.08.2003Request for further processing filed
11.08.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.08.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5619850  (PALMER DONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 13-48 * * column 4, lines 13-30 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5333882  (AZIBERT HENRI V [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 7, lines 33-62 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]FR1554863  (STE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION) [A] 1-8 * page 4, column 1, lines 21-31 * * page 4, column 1, line 50 - page 4, column 2, line 2 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]US4645415  (HOVAN EDWARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, lines 30-56 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US3025115  (SHEVCHENKO RICHARD P, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 27 * * figures 1,3 *