Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004734

EP1004734 - Hinge arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Raymond, Ralph
9 Chatsworth Gardens Wolverhampton
West Midlands WV6 8UU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Raymond, Ralph
9 Chatsworth Gardens
Wolverhampton, West Midlands WV6 8UU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Swindell & Pearson
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date99309241.019.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateGB1998002544523.11.1998         Original published format: GB 9825445
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004734
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004734
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:E05D3/02, E05D11/00
[2000/22]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/08]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Scharnieranordnung[2000/22]
English:Hinge arrangement[2000/22]
French:Agencement de charnière[2000/22]
Examination procedure01.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/42]
23.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2167585  (MULVANEY ANTHONY J) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,12,15,17,21,24 * page 1, column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 37; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,9,10,19,20,22,25-30;
 [XY]GB2252787  (STOVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-8,13-18,21,24 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 6 - line 9; figures 1-3 * [Y] 19,20,22;
 [X]US2238530  (LICKTEIG ALBERT F) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-15,17,21,24 * page 1, column 1, line 45 - page 2, column 1, line 36 * * page 1, column 2, line 52 - page 2, column 1, line 2; figures 5-10 *;
 [X]US2777156  (WEISGARBER NORMAN A) [X] 1,2,4-15,17 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]DE2852394  (KIEFER WINFRIED H DIPL PHYS) [Y] 3 * page 16, paragraph 4 - page 17, line 3; figures 3A-3D,4 *;
 [Y]FR778235  (FAURE PERE ET FILS) [Y] 25-30 * page 1, line 33 - line 57; figures 1-4 *
 [Y]  HANSON, "sliding bracket hinge", NAVY TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198003), vol. 5, no. 3, XP002163345 [Y] 9,10 * page 49, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *