Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004431

EP1004431 - Cam mechanism and pressing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2002  [2002/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Morito Co., Ltd.
2-4, Minami-hommachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-0054 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Morito Co., Ltd.
2-4, Minami-hommachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-0054 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyazaki, Mitsuru
12-41, Kitabatake 3-chome, Abeno-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-0035 / JP
02 / Fujita, Keiji
51-7,Kaminoshimacho-kita 1-chome,Yao-shi
Osaka 581-0845 / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Laight, Martin Harvey
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Laight, Martin Harvey
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date99309265.922.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateJP1998033355625.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33355698
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004431
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004431
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B30B15/28, F16P5/00, B30B1/14, F16P3/16
[2000/34]
Former International [2000/22]B30B15/28, F16P5/00, B30B1/14
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/19]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nockenmechanismus und Pressvorrichtung[2000/22]
English:Cam mechanism and pressing apparatus[2000/22]
French:Mécanisme à came et dispositif de pressage[2000/22]
Examination procedure24.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/04]
01.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.04.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.04.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.04.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4541558  (HERTEN ERNST [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [E]EP0983840  (MCKECHNIE UK LTD [GB]) [E] 1,6,7 * abstract *;
 [A]US4570500  (RICHTER ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,6,7,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2046393  (PRYM WERKE WILLIAM) [A] 1,6,7,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0391207  (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US4485541  (SEKI FUMIO [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,10,11 * abstract *