Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006258

EP1006258 - Plug apparatus for use in a subterranean well [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, TX 75381-9052 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/09]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052 Dallas
Texas 75381-9052 / US
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brothers, Lance E.
928 South 8th
Chickasha, Oklahoma 73018 / US
02 / Eoff, Larry S.
2201 Cedar
Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99309269.122.11.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateUS1998020461901.12.1998         Original published format: US 204619
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1006258
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1006258
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006258
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B33/12, E21B23/00
[2001/15]
Former International [2000/23]E21B33/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/01]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bohrlochstopfen[2000/23]
English:Plug apparatus for use in a subterranean well[2000/23]
French:Bouchon pour puits[2000/23]
Examination procedure01.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
26.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2005Fee for grant paid
20.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL01.03.2006
DE02.06.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2006/45]NL01.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0681087  (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 40; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US4018286  (GALL JAMES W, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 7 *;
 [A]US5607017  (OWENS STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 42 - line 54; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5685372  (GANO JOHN C [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2321074  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 3, line 9 - line 18 *;
 [A]US4715755  (HESSELMAR KARL G [SE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 1 - line 10; figures 1,5 * * column 5, line 22 - line 27 *;
 [A]US5261488  (GULLET PAUL D [GB], et al) [A] 1,6 * figure 2; claims 4,5 *;
 [A]US3762473  (WOLK P) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 30 - line 33; figures 1,2 *
by applicantEP0939194