blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1017208

EP1017208 - Method and system for providing wireless mobile server and peer-to-peer services with dynamic DNS update [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/27]Method and system for providing wireless mobile server and peer-to-peer services with dynami DNS update
[2000/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Jin
6436 New Albany Road
Lisle, Illinois 60532. / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander, et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander, et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/25]Sarup, David Alexander, et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2000/27]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99309328.523.11.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998020596304.12.1998         Original published format: US 205963
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1017208
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1017208
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017208
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:H04L29/12, H04L29/06
[2000/27]
CPC:
H04W8/04 (EP,US); H04L61/5014 (EP,US); H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/4535 (EP,US); H04L61/5007 (EP,US); H04L61/5076 (EP,US);
H04L61/5084 (EP,US); H04W80/04 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/17]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur drahtlosen mobile Server und Gleichrangigendiensten mit Dynamische DNS Aktualisierung[2000/27]
English:Method and system for providing wireless mobile server and peer-to-peer services with dynamic DNS update[2000/39]
French:Méthode et système pour fournir un serveur mobile sans fil et services à niveau équivalent avec mise à jour DNS dynamique[2000/27]
Former [2000/27]Method and system for providing wireless mobile server and peer-to-peer services with dynami DNS update
Examination procedure23.11.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
04.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2004Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2004Fee for grant paid
24.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0483547  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-24 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 10 * * column 5, line 49 - column 8, line 17 *;
 [A]  - PERKINS C E ET AL, "DHCP for mobile networking with TCP/IP", PROCEEDINGS IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, (19950627), XP002132695 [A] 1-24 * page 258, column R, line 24 - page 261, column L, line 56 * * figure 3 *
 [A]  - PERKINS C E ET AL, "USING DHCP WITH COMPUTERS THAT MOVE", WIRELESS NETWORKS,US,ACM, (19951001), vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 341 - 353, XP000538245 [A] 1-24 * page 343, column L, line 39 - page 346, column L, line 23 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01200851
 [A]  - VERJINSKI R D, "PHASE,A PORTABLE HOST ACCESS SYSTEM ENVIRONMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. (MILCOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1989), vol. -, pages 806 - 809, XP000131918 [A] 1-24 * page 806, column L, line 22 - page 808, column L, line 48 * * figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.