Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004522

EP1004522 - Pouch for containing retort food [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daiki Foods Yugen Kaisha
3-28, Sumiyoshicho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 231-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Daiki Foods Yugen Kaisha
3-28, Sumiyoshicho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugahara, Tsutomu
14-16, Onoecho, Zushioku, Yamashina-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8453 / JP
02 / Kagiya, Tsutomu
3-16, Kagura Okacho, Sakyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8311 / JP
03 / Ohki, Hisaharu
1-22-2-201, Fuchinobe Honcho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0006 / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99309351.723.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateJP1998033249424.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33249498
JP1999032500216.11.1999         Original published format: JP 32500299
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004522
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004522
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/24, A23L3/26, B65D81/00
[2001/18]
Former International [2000/22]B65D81/24
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/04]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beutel für erhitzbare Nahrungsmittel[2000/22]
English:Pouch for containing retort food[2000/22]
French:Sachet pour nourriture pouvant être chauffée[2000/22]
Examination procedure06.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
03.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/24]
02.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5482726  (ROBINSON JR WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 10 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 19; example .; claims 1,17,25 *;
 [X]GB754336  (ELECTRONIZED CHEM CORP) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB657295  (ELECTRONIZED CHEM CORP) [A] 1,2,10 * page 4, line 11 - line 34; claim - * * page 3, line 86 - line 127 * * page 3, line 55 - line 75 *;
 [X]GB745962  (ELECTRONISED CHEMICALS CORP) [X] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2176688  (APV INT LTD) [X] 1-10 * figure 2 of 1/1, details 25-31a *; page 2, line 30 - line 54; claims 3,7,8,10,12 *;
 [X]US3780308  (NABLO S) [X] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5273767  (BURGUM DAN R [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * column 3, line 18; example -; claim 40 *;
 [X]US4379117  (BAIRD JR WILLIAM G, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 11, line 57 - column 12, line 4 * * column 10, line 21 - line 29 *;
 [X]US5096553  (ROSS GRAEME D [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5470597  (MENDENHALL VON T [US]) [X] 1-10 * example 6; tables 4-6 *;
 [X]GB832076  (ARTHUR CHARLESBY) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9940803  (ACCELERATOR TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [PA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN1166035  (AUWO INTERNATIONAL SCIENCE AND [CN]) [X] 10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5603972  (MCFARLAND ARCHIE R [US]) [X] 10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5807598  (LIBERMAN BARNET L [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 41 - line 64; claims 1,21 *