Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004342

EP1004342 - Pressure swing adsorption gas separation process and system using single adsorber and product recycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Sircar, Shivaji
1508 Bogie Avenue
Wescosville, PA 18106 / US
02 / Naheiri, Tarik
2775 Kuter Road
Bath, PA 18014 / US
03 / Fischer, Jochen Rainer
1932 Sunset Drive
Whitehall, PA 18052 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Burford, Anthony Frederick
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Burford, Anthony Frederick
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date99309354.123.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateUS1998020020825.11.1998         Original published format: US 200208
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004342
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004342
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004342
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/047
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Druckwechseladsorptionsverfahren zur Gastrennung und Vorrichtung unter Verwendung eines einzelnen Adsorbers und von Produktrückführung[2000/22]
English:Pressure swing adsorption gas separation process and system using single adsorber and product recycle[2000/22]
French:Procédé de séparation d'un mélange gazeux par adsorption à pression alternée et système utilisant un adsorbeur unique et recyclage de produit[2003/39]
Former [2000/22]Procédé de séparation d'un mélange gazeux par adsorption à pression alternée et système utilsant un adsorbeur unique et recyclage de produit
Examination procedure30.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
17.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2004Fee for grant paid
31.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
PT31.08.2004
IE23.11.2004
LU23.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
IE23.11.2004
LU23.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/25]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
IE23.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/13]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/48]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/18]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
SE30.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[DX]US4561865  (MCCOMBS NORMAN R [US], et al) [DX] 1-5,9-23 * column 6, line 10 - line 59; figures 1,3 * * column 7, line 4 - line 48 *;
 [DX]US5370728  (LASALA KIMBERLY A [US], et al) [DX] 1,3-23 * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 2; figure 1 * * column 8, line 39 - line 43 *;
 [DXA]US4892566  (BANSAL RAVINDER K [US], et al) [DX] 1-5,9-13,15,16 * abstract * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 11 * * column 4, line 2 - line 19 * [A] 6-8,17-23;
 [XA]EP0821992  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1,3-5,9-13,15,16 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-4 * [A] 17-23