EP1014125 - Dielectric optical filter network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Corporation World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donaldson, Alan 35 North Rocks Churston, Paignton, Devon, TQ4 6LF / GB | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group Harlow Laboratories London Road, Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group Harlow Laboratories London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2003/16] | Anderson, Angela, et al Nortel Networks Limited IP Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2001/12] | Bewley, Ewan Stuart, et al Nortel Networks, IP Law Group, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Laurence, Simon French, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309358.2 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | GB19980028330 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9828330 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014125 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014125 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28, G02B6/34, H04J14/02 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G02B6/29365 (EP,US);
G02B6/2938 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | G02B6/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerk mit dielektrischen optischen Filtern | [2000/26] | English: | Dielectric optical filter network | [2000/26] | French: | Réseau utilisant filtres diélectriques optiques | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0859251 (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7,9 * page 4 - page 10; figures 1-10 * [Y] 2,3,6,8,10; | [X]JPH1078528 ; | [X]US4244045 (NOSU KIYOSHI, et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 28 - column 10, line 30; figures 12,14-17 *; | [Y]US5028111 (YUMOTO MITSURU [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 34; figure 13 *; | [Y]JPH1075215 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10078528 A 19980324 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10075215 A 19980317 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD <KDD>;K D D KAITEI CABLE SYST KK) [Y] 3,6,8,10 * the whole document * | [A] - BENDELLI G ET AL, "A New Structure For Tuneable Optical Add-drop Multiplexers", 22ND EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, Oslo, (19960915), vol. 3, pages 139 - 142, XP010303098 [A] 1,3,6,8,10 * the whole document * |