Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013433

EP1013433 - Multi-tabbed orifice plates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.08.2009  [2009/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
Scitex Digital Printing, Inc.
3100 Research Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45420-4099 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Morris, Brian G.
16 Monteray Avenue
Dayton, Ohio 45419 / US
02 / Sexton, Richard W.
6919 Taylorsville Road
Huber Heights, Ohio 45424 / US
03 / McWilliams, Kenneth R.
10302 S. Union Road
Miamisburg, Ohio 45342 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/31]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2000/26]Freed, Arthur Woolf , et al
Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BY / GB
Application number, filing date99309503.329.11.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateUS1998021120514.12.1998         Original published format: US 211205
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1013433
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1013433
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/16
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/19]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Düsenplatte mit mehreren Laschen[2000/26]
English:Multi-tabbed orifice plates[2000/26]
French:Plaques à orifices à plusieurs pattes[2000/26]
Examination procedure21.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
18.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/35]
01.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0514706  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 4, line 50 - column 8, line 49; figures 1A-6E * [A] 3,5,8-10;
 [X]US5847725  (CLELAND TODD A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 64; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH10244676  (XEROX CORP) [A] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-5 * * abstract *;
 [A]US4347522  (BAHL SURINDER K, et al) [A] 1,4,7 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0867294  (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 6, line 52 - column 10, line 38; figures 5-7 *
by applicantUS4972204