Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013437

EP1013437 - Printhead flush and cleaning system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
Scitex Digital Printing, Inc.
3100 Research Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45420-4099 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Enz, Richard T.
1684 Brookgreen Ct.
Dayton, Ohio 45440 / US
02 / Blum, John N.
4522 Croftshire Dr.
Kettering, Ohio 45440 / US
03 / Lyman, Dan C.
317 Parktrad Ln.
Cincinnati, Ohio 45238 / US
04 / Loyd, John C.
7955 Brainard Woods Dr.
Centerville, Ohio 45458 / US
05 / Simon, Robert J.
2217 Hillrise Circle
Bellbrook, Ohio 45305 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/43]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2004/40]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie Département Brevets CRET-Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2000/26]Freed, Arthur Woolf , et al
Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BY / GB
Application number, filing date99309505.829.11.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateUS1998021121314.12.1998         Original published format: US 211213
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1013437
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1013437
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/17
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/11]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Spülung und Reinigung eines Druckkopfs[2000/26]
English:Printhead flush and cleaning system and method[2000/26]
French:Système et procédé de rinçage et nettoyage pour une tête d'impression[2000/26]
Examination procedure21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
14.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2010Fee for grant paid
17.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9317867  (WILLETT INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4623897  (BROWN MARK E [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 29 - column 8, line 59; figure - *;
 [A]EP0424008  (LINX PRINTING TECH [GB]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 30 - column 9, line 45; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4947187  (IWAGAMI FUSAO [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 61 - column 10, line 10; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4296418  (YAMAZAKI HIROSHI, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 16 - column 7, line 15 *
by applicantUS5706039
 US5570117
 US5555461
 US5557307