Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006728

EP1006728 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2008
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.07.2011  [2011/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/27]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ando, Tsutomu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford & Co
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99309711.202.12.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateJP1998034421503.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34421598
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1006728
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1006728
Date:10.10.2001
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006728
Date:04.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2002/27]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildverabeitungsvorrichtung[2000/23]
English:Image processing apparatus[2000/23]
French:Appareil de traitement d'image[2000/23]
Examination procedure04.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/20]
07.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2007Fee for grant paid
14.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
DE05.10.2007
IT31.12.2007
FR29.02.2008
[2011/27]
Former [2008/36]NL04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
DE05.10.2007
FR29.02.2008
Former [2008/32]NL04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
FR29.02.2008
Former [2008/28]NL04.07.2007
SE04.10.2007
Former [2008/17]NL04.07.2007
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0969668  (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9948296  (INTERTRUST TECH CORP [US]) [PX] 1-24 * abstract * * page 22, line 1 - line 17 * * page 73, line 4 - line 11 *;
 [A]EP0715246  (XEROX CORP [US])
 [A]  HILL ET AL., "MPEG-4 IPR PROTECTION REQUIREMENTS SPECIFICATIONS", ACTS PROJECT AC302 - MIRADOR, (199807), XP002155817 [A] 1-24 * page 11, paragraph 1.5 - page 14; figure 3 *
 [A]  CASALINO F ET AL, "MPEG-4 systems, concepts and implementation", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980526), ISSN 0302-9743, pages 504 - 517, XP002120837 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-64594-2_119
 [A]  "N2323 - MPEG-4 Overview - (Dublin version)", INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION - ORGANISATION INTERNATIONALE DE NORMALISATION, ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, (199807), pages 1 - 55, XP002120014 [A] 1-24 * the whole document *
 [A]  ELEFTHERIADIS A, "The MPEG-4 System and Description Languages: From Practice to Theory", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, XX, XX, (19970609), pages 1480 - 1483, XP002120475