EP1008482 - Adaptive cruise control system and methodology, including control of inter-vehicle spacing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | For all designated states JAGUAR CARS LIMITED Abbey Road Whitley Coventry CV3 4LF / GB | [2009/25] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | ||
For all designated states JAGUAR CARS LIMITED Abbey Road Whitley Coventry CV3 4LF / GB | |||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | ||
For all designated states JAGUAR CARS LIMITED Browns Lane Allesley Coventry CV5 9DR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richardson, Michael Julian 153, Bromsgrove Road Redditch, Surrey B97 4SG / GB | 02 /
Barber, Philip Alexander 37, Brookvale Grove Olton Solihull, B92 7JH / GB | 03 /
King, Paul John 3, Minster Crescent Leicester, LE04 OJB / GB | 04 /
Engelman, Gerald H. 3820 Syracuse Dearborn, Michigan 48124 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Needle, Jacqueline, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309746.8 | 03.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | US19980207007 | 07.12.1998 Original published format: US 207007 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008482 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1008482 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008482 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, G05B13/04, // G05B17/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
G05B13/042 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0009 (EP);
B60W2050/0022 (EP);
B60W2520/125 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | B60K31/00, G05B13/04, G05B17/00, G05D1/02 | ||
Former IPC [2000/24] | B60K31/00, G05B17/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/50] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Adaptives, abstandsbezogenes Fahrgeschwindigkeitsregelsystem und zugehöriges Steuerungsverfahren | [2000/24] | English: | Adaptive cruise control system and methodology, including control of inter-vehicle spacing | [2000/24] | French: | Régulateur de vitesse adaptif pour régler la distance entre deux véhicules, et procédé correspondant | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.12.2009 | IT | 03.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5493302 (WOLL JERRY [US], et al) [DA] 1-5 * figure 4B; claim - *; | [XP]DE19848824 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [XP] 1* figure 3 *; | [E]EP0982172 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1 * figure 17B *; | [X] - YOUCEF-TOUMI K ET AL, "THE APPLICATION OF TIME DELAY CONTROL TO AN INTELLIGENT CRUISE CONTROL SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE (ACC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19920624), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0210-9, pages 1743 - 1747, XP000343593 [X] 1 * figure 4 * | [A] - MAYR R, "INTELLIGENT CRUISE CONTROL FOR VEHICLE BASED ON FEED-BACK LINEARIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19940629), ISBN 0-7803-1784-X, pages 16 - 20, XP000515245 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5053979 | US5396426 | US5400864 | US5454442 | US5493302 | US5594645 | US5629851 |