Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009065

EP1009065 - Waterproof connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kurimoto, Naoya, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99309787.206.12.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1998035034809.12.1998         Original published format: JP 35034898
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1009065
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1009065
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009065
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52, H01R13/436
[2000/39]
Former International [2000/24]H01R13/52
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/24]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserdichter Verbinder[2000/24]
English:Waterproof connector[2000/24]
French:Connecteur étanche[2000/24]
Examination procedure24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
01.10.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
21.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
19.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2002Fee for grant paid
21.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5782657  (WOLLA DAVID MAURICE [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 53 * [A] 10;
 [Y]EP0855765  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3441559  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 4,6-9 * abstract * * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 18 *;
 [A]DE19602435  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,10 * abstract *;
 [A]US5800217  (LEHNER ANTONIO [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *