Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008419

EP1008419 - Vertical axis translation mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Fanuc Ltd
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sawada, Kiyoshi
75-7, Kakita, Shimizu-cho
Suntou-gun, Shizuoka, 411-0904 / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Akira, Room 14-501, Fanuc
Manshonharimomi, 3494-2, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi, 401-0511 / JP
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Billington, Lawrence Emlyn
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99309885.408.12.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1998036846310.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36846398
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1008419
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1008419
Date:10.04.2002
[2002/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1008419
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23Q5/28, B23Q5/34, B23Q1/56, B23Q1/26, B25H1/16, B25H1/18, B23Q1/03, B23Q1/58
[2002/15]
Former International [2000/24]B23Q5/28, B23Q5/34, B23Q1/56, B23Q1/26, B25H1/16, B25H1/18
Designated contracting statesDE [2003/01]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Bewegungen längs einer vertikalen Achse[2000/24]
English:Vertical axis translation mechanism[2000/24]
French:Mécanisme de translation suivant un axe vertical[2000/24]
Examination procedure01.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
10.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2004Fee for grant paid
23.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH1086026  ;
 [A]JPS62124842
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, [AD] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871111), vol. 011, no. 344, Database accession no. (M - 640), [A] 1-11 * abstract *