Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018527

EP1018527 - Nano-porous copolymer films having low dielectric constants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mandal, Robert P.
12472 Arroya de Arguello
Saratoga California 95070 / US
02 / Cheung, David W.
235 Billingsgate Lane
Foster City California 94404 / US
03 / Lee, Peter Wai-Mun
1037 Bentoak Ln
San Jose California 95129 / US
04 / Lang, Chi-I
1260 Ayala Drive No. 207
Sunnyvale California 94086 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date99309890.409.12.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateUS1998020779109.12.1998         Original published format: US 207791
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018527
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1018527
Date:27.10.2004
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/312, C08G61/02, C09D165/04, B05D1/00
[2004/44]
Former International [2000/28]C08G61/02, B05D1/00, H01L21/312
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2005/29]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nano-poröse Kopolymerschichten mit niedriger dielektrischen Konstante[2000/28]
English:Nano-porous copolymer films having low dielectric constants[2000/28]
French:Couches copolymeres nano-poreuses à basse constante dielectrique[2000/28]
Examination procedure26.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
15.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/24]
11.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH10172966  ;
 [X]US3600216  (STEWART DONALD D) [X] 1 * column 2, line 3 - column 6, line 62 *;
 [Y]WO9715951  (SPECIALTY COATING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 2,7-9 * page 5, line 26 - page 11, line 12; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0881668  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 10 *;
 [Y]US5556473  (OLSON ROGER A [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * column 5, line 7 - column 11, line 27; figures 1,5 *
 [DY]  - TAYLOR K J ET AL., "Parylene copolymers low-k dielectrics", MAT.RES.SOC.SYMP.PROC., PITTSBURGH, PA, USA, (1997), vol. 746, pages 197 - 205, XP008034446 [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10172966 A 19980626 (TEXAS INSTR INC <TI>) [X] 1,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DABRAL S ET AL, "A A' A'' A''' POLY-TERTRAFLUORO-P-XYLYLENE AS AN INTERLAYER DIELECTRIC FOR THIN FILM MULTICHIP MODULES AND INTEGRATED CIRCUITS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19930901), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1071-1023, pages 1825 - 1832, XP000403660 [Y] 1,5,6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.586485