EP1026114 - Method and apparatus for creating a discontinuity in a stack interfolded sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FPNA Acquisition Corporation 3060 South Ridge Road Green Bay Wisconsin 54304 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states FPNA Acquisition Corporation 3060 South Ridge Road Green Bay, Wisconsin 54304 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Green Bay Engineering Corporation 1733 Suburban Drive DePere, WI 54115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Barton J. W1668 Hwy 64 Marinette, WI54143 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309923.3 | 09.12.1999 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | US19990228708 | 12.01.1999 Original published format: US 228708 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026114 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026114 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026114 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/24, B65H33/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
B65H33/12 (EP,US);
B65H45/24 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Unterbrechung in einem Stapel von ineinandergefalteten Blättern | [2000/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for creating a discontinuity in a stack interfolded sheets | [2000/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de création d'une discontinuité dans une pile de feuilles enchevêtrées | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2007 | BE | 25.04.2007 | CH | 25.04.2007 | CY | 25.04.2007 | DK | 25.04.2007 | FI | 25.04.2007 | LI | 25.04.2007 | NL | 25.04.2007 | SE | 25.07.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | PT | 25.09.2007 | LU | 09.12.2007 | IE | 10.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/48] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4717135 (HATHAWAY JOHN M [US]) [X] 1-21 * column 5, line 13 - column 8, line 18 * * column 8, line 51 - line 57; figure - * [A] ; | [XA]EP0291211 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO [US]) [X] 1,12,13,16 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-3 * [A] 6; | [DXA]US5088707 (STEMMLER KURT [DE]) [DX] 12,13,16 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 37 * * column 6, line 50 - column 8, line 36; figures 1-4,6,7 *[A] 1,6 |