Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008466

EP1008466 - Pneumatic tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED
6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED
6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugihara, Hideaki
18 Tsukaguchi-cho 2-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyog-ken / JP
02 / Ohkita, Koji
2-A Umetsubo-cho 6-chome, 114-banchi
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2003/33]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/24]Stewart, Charles Geoffrey
Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop
Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB
Application number, filing date99309976.110.12.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1998035319811.12.1998         Original published format: JP 35319898
JP1999008224525.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8224599
JP1999033455925.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33455999
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1008466
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1008466
Date:13.06.2001
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1008466
Date:04.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/04, B60C11/13, B60C11/00, // B60C115:00
[2001/24]
Former International [2000/24]B60C11/04, B60C11/13, B60C11/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/10]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftreifen[2000/24]
English:Pneumatic tyre[2000/24]
French:Bandage pneumatique[2000/24]
Examination procedure20.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2004Fee for grant paid
04.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH09193615  ;
 [Y]US5595619  (TANAKA MASATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 33 * * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [Y]US4619300  (TOKUNAGA SEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 3 - line 45 * * figure 4 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, [X] 1-3,5,9,11 * abstract * [Y] 6-8