Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018740

EP1018740 - Method of avoiding audio playback interruption while changing disc in a multi disc CD player by using enhanced compression rate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Ford Motor Company
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dark, Jay P.
45234 Prestbury Road
Canton, Michigan 48187 / US
02 / Taljanovic, Husein
422, Kellogg Apt 73
Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US
03 / Zeneli, Ylldes
4467, Lincoln Blvd.
Dearborn Heights, Michigan 48125 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date99310041.113.12.1999
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateUS1999022635806.01.1999         Original published format: US 226358
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018740
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1018740
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018740
Date:03.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/00, G11B7/00, G11B19/02
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/28]G11B27/00, G11B7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beseitigung der Unterbrechung der Audiowiedergabe beim Plattenwechsel in einem Plattenabspielgerät mit Plattenwechsler durch die Benutzung eines verstärkten Kompressionsgrades[2001/38]
English:Method of avoiding audio playback interruption while changing disc in a multi disc CD player by using enhanced compression rate[2000/28]
French:Méthode pour éviter l'interruption de la reproduction audio lors du changement de disque dans lecteur multi-disque en utilisant un taux de compression accru[2000/28]
Former [2000/28]Verfahren zur Beseitigung der Unterbrechung der Audiowiedergabe beim Plattenwechsel in einem Plattenabspielgerät mit Plattenwechseler durch die Benutzung eines verstärkten Kompressionsgrades
Examination procedure07.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
17.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2002Fee for grant paid
17.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US5572380  (FUJINAMI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * column 3, lines 54-57; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 51-58; figure 2; claims 1,2 * * column 3, lines 9-40 *;
 [A]JPH08255416  ;
 [A]JPH0969263  ;
 [A]US5559776  (IKENAGA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1,6,9 * column 8; figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]BE1007720  (STAAR SA [BE]) [A] 1,6,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5680379  (ISHIDA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH06139702  ;
 [A]JPH06103699
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [A] 1,6,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, [A] 1,6,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940818), vol. 018, no. 445, Database accession no. (P - 1789), [A] 1,6,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940715), vol. 018, no. 379, Database accession no. (P - 1771), [A] 1,6,9 * abstract *