Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020971

EP1020971 - Waterproofing arrangement for wire harness [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.09.2010  [2010/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[2009/40]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uchiyama, Kenichi
c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City Mie 510-8503 / JP
 [2009/20]
Former [2000/29]01 / Uchiyama, Kenichi
c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP
Representative(s)Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99310236.720.12.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateJP1999000847914.01.1999         Original published format: JP 847999
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020971
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020971
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020971
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/22
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/31]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserundurchlässige Kabelbaumanordnung[2000/29]
English:Waterproofing arrangement for wire harness[2000/29]
French:Arrangement imperméable d'un faisceau de cables[2000/29]
Examination procedure13.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
01.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2009Fee for grant paid
20.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0320891  (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,9,10 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 57; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5270487  (SAWAMURA NAOHITO [JP]) [A] 1,5,9,10 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3903059  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *