Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013226

EP1013226 - Method and apparatus for optimal data mapping of power doppler images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.02.2010
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.03.2010  [2010/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Becker, David D.
9733 North Lake Drive
Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53217 / US
02 / Seyed-Bolorforosh, Mir Said
17425 River Birch Drive Apartment 2
Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US
03 / Washburn, Michael Joseph
12920 West Graham Street
New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US
[2000/29]
Former [2000/26]01 / Becker, David D.
9733 North Lake Drive
Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53217 / US
02 / Seyed-Bolorforosh, Mir Said
17425 Drive Birch Drive, Apartment 2
Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US
03 / Washburn, Michael Joseph
12920 West Graham Street
New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/26]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99310458.722.12.1999
[2000/26]
Priority number, dateUS1998022051924.12.1998         Original published format: US 220519
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1013226
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1013226
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/06, G01S15/89, G01S7/52
[2001/22]
Former International [2000/26]A61B8/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2002/08]
Former [2000/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät für optimale Datenfiles von Leistungs- Doppler - Abbildungen[2000/26]
English:Method and apparatus for optimal data mapping of power doppler images[2000/26]
French:Méthode et appareil pour cartographier les données optimales des images obtenues par effet doppler[2000/26]
Examination procedure30.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
05.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/10]
10.10.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/10]
Appeal following examination06.06.2006Appeal received No.  T1281/06
09.08.2006Statement of grounds filed
12.08.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
18.08.2009Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9846139  (ACUSON [US]) [A] 1,2,4,9,13,15,16,20,23 * page 5, line 26 - page 15, line 12; tables 1-4 *;
 [PA]US5882306  (RAMAMURTHY BHASKAR [US], et al) [PA] 1,2,4,9,13,15,16,20,23 * column 4, line 3 - column 8, line 12; tables 1-4 *;
 [A]US5285788  (ARENSON JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 12 - line 46; table 2 *;
 [A]US5474073  (SCHWARTZ GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 22 - line 38 * * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 14; table 1 *;
 [A]US5471990  (THIRSK GRAHAM [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 50; table 1 *;
 [A]DE19819794  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 25 * * column 5, line 22 - line 63 * * column 10, line 8 - line 68; tables 1-3 *