Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017010

EP1017010 - Electrostatic discharge protection for sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UPEK, Inc.
5900 Christie Avenue
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2008/41]
Former [2007/29]For all designated states
UPEK, Inc.
2200 Powell Street Suite 300
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
Former [2006/05]For all designated states
UPEK Inc.
2001 Center Street Suit 500
Berkeley CA 94704 / US
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive
Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lepert, Arnaud Yves
3538 O'Connor Drive
Lafayette, California 94549 / US
02 / Thomas, Danielle A.
16312 Fallkirk Drive
Dallas, Texas 75248 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)WP Thompson , et al
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]W.P. Thompson & Co. , et al
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2004/35]Driver, Virginia Rozanne , et al
Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2000/27]Palmer, Roger , et al
PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date99310545.123.12.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateUS1998022362930.12.1998         Original published format: US 223629
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1017010
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1017010
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017010
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/20
[2008/14]
Former International [2000/27]G06K9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/34]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beschützung Sensoren gegen elektrostatische Entladung[2000/27]
English:Electrostatic discharge protection for sensors[2000/27]
French:Proctection de capteurs contre décharge électrostatique[2000/27]
Examination procedure25.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/30]
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2008Fee for grant paid
19.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200507   M06   Fee paid on   04.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9405042  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-24 * claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]WO9852147  (HARRIS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-24 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 15; figures 1-3 * * page 7, line 23 - line 29; figure 7 *
ExaminationEP0457398
    INGLIS D., ET AL., "SA 17.7:A ROBUST, 1.8V 250MUW DIRECT-CONTACT 500DPI FINGERPRINT SENSOR.", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19980101), ISSN 0193-6530, ISBN 978-1-4799-0918-6, page 284/285., XP000856844
    TARTAGNI M., GUERRIERI R., "A FINGERPRINT SENSOR BASED ON THE FEEDBACK CAPACITIVE SENSING SCHEME.", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19980101), vol. 33., no. 01., doi:10.1109/4.654945, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 133 - 142., XP000766627

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.654945
    "MISCELLANEOUS SENSORS", CAPACITIVE SENSORS: DESIGN AND APPLICATION, XX, XX, XX, (19970101), pages 122 - 146, XP008017689