Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0931821

EP0931821 - Primer composition and method of effecting adhesion for sealing compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.12.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okamoto, Toshihiko
11-21, Kotsukayama 6-chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-002 / JP
02 / Chiba, Makoto
6-512, Maikodai 6-chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0046 / JP
03 / Takase, Junji
5-20, Nishiakashicho 5-chome
Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673-0011 / JP
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99400176.626.01.1999
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateJP1998001276026.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1276098
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0931821
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0931821
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09D201/10
[1999/30]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2000/51]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Grundierungszusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Schaffung von Adhäsion für Dichtungsmittel[1999/30]
English:Primer composition and method of effecting adhesion for sealing compositions[1999/30]
French:Compositions de couche de fond et méthode pour effectuer l'adhésion pour compositions d'étancheité[1999/30]
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
03.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2005Fee for grant paid
30.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/04]
05.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5223575  (MORI MASAHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 66; example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0758029  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 8 * * page 11, lines 41-54; example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0252372  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 1 - page 16, line 11 * * page 15, lines 12-16 * * page 15, line 30 * * page 16, line 6; example -; claim - * * page 10, lines 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0255170  (ENICHEM SINTESI [IT]) [X] 1,3-6 * page 2, line 35 - page 5, line 9; example - *;
 [X]EP0287025  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 1 - page 10, line 51; example - * * page 2, lines 39-43 * * page 10, line 46 * * page 5, lines 16-26 * * page 5, line 27 - page 10, line 20 *;
 [X]EP0312967  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 44 - page 11, line 13; examples 3,4 * * page 6, line 43 - page 9, line 27 * * page 6, lines 25-42 *;
 [XP]EP0839872  (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 34 - page 8, line 48; example - *;
 [X]EP0934984  (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0045]; example -; claim - *;
 WO9731066  [ ] (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al);
 [X]EP0934956  (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] - [0071]; example -; claim - *;
 WO9731032  [ ] (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al);
 [X]US4349603  (KAMEYAMA MASAO, et al) [X] 1,2 * example - *