Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0939195

EP0939195 - Apparatus and method for determining a drilling mode to optimize formation evaluation measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Schlumberger Limited (a Netherland Antilles corp.)
having an office at: 277 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10172 / US
For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:DE  DK  IE  IT 
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/38]For:GB 
Schlumberger Limited (a Netherland Antilles corp.)
having an office at: 277 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10172 / US
For:FR 
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:DE  DK  IE  IT 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
Former [1999/35]For:GB 
Schlumberger Limited (a Netherland Antilles corp.)
having an office at: 277 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10172 / US
For:FR 
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
F-75007 Paris / FR
For:DE  DK  IE  IT 
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG The Hague / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Crary, Steven F.
14 Howell Lane
Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US
02 / Heidler, Ralf
5010 Grove West Boulevard
No. 1909, Stafford, Texas 77477 / US
03 / Poitzsch, Martin E.
4807 Periwinkle Court
Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US
04 / Esmersoy, Cengiz
3815 Palmer Court
Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Raybaud, Hélène F. A.
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger
Intellectual Property Law Department
1, rue Henri Becquerel
B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Raybaud, Hélène F. A.
Etudes & Productions Schlumberger Intellectual Property Law Department 1 Rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Former [2003/24]Raybaud, Hélène F. A.
Intellectual Property Law Department Schlumberger Riboud Product Centre 1, rue Becquerel BP 202
92142 Clamart / FR
Former [1999/35]Hagel, Francis , et al
ETUDES ET PRODUCTIONS SCHLUMBERGER Service Brevets B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99400260.804.02.1999
[1999/35]
Priority number, dateUS1998003192627.02.1998         Original published format: US 31926
[1999/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0939195
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0939195
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0939195
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B47/12, E21B47/00, E21B44/00
[2000/47]
Former International [1999/35]E21B47/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2001/32]
Former [1999/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Bohrmethode, um Formationsbewertungsmessungen zu optimieren[1999/35]
English:Apparatus and method for determining a drilling mode to optimize formation evaluation measurements[1999/35]
French:Dispositif et procédé de détermination du mode de forage, pour l'optimisation de l'évaluation des mesures de formation[1999/35]
Examination procedure02.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
09.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2004Fee for grant paid
19.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03076154.8  / EP1335108
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
IE04.02.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2006/24]DK15.12.2004
IE04.02.2005
Former [2005/46]DK15.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0617196  (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-15,19,20 * column 1, line 11 - line 18 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 2 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 2 * [Y] 21-25;
 [Y]EP0718641  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [Y] 21-25 * page 20, line 50 - line 59 * * page 10, line 3 - line 10 * * page 4, line 57 - line 60 * * page 16, line 52 - line 59 *;
 [X]US3865201  (HADEN ELARD L) [X] 1,5,12 * column 2, line 6 - line 8 * * column 2, line 51 - line 55 *
by applicantUS5130950
 US5241273
 US5017778
 US5148407
 US5585556
 US5705927
 US5448227
 US5280243