Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033852

EP1033852 - DC offset correction for direct-conversion receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.03.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road, Tsim Sha Tsui,Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
Former [2005/31]For all designated states
TAM Holdings Limited
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Sevenhans, Joannes Mathilda Josephus
Prins Kavellei 126
2930 Brasschaat / BE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Feray, Valérie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Former [2008/33]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Consult 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony / FR
Former [2006/17]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand
F-92160 Antony / FR
Former [2005/15]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenné Conseil 44/52, rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Former [2000/36]Narmon, Gisèle
Industrial Property Department, Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1
2018 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date99400271.505.02.1999
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033852
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/06
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Unterdrückung von Gleichspannungsversätzen für Null-ZF-Funkempfänger[2000/36]
English:DC offset correction for direct-conversion receiver[2000/36]
French:Suppression du décalage de composante continue pour récepteur radio de type fréquence intermédiaire zéro[2000/36]
Examination procedure06.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
08.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/16]
24.11.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
18.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0455089  (ALCATEL TRANSMISSION [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 5 - line 34 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 29 * * figures 2,3 * * claim 4 *;
 [X]US5442655  (DEDIC IAN J [GB], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 24 - line 49 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 3,5,6 *;
 [A]EP0343273  (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 4,7 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0851640  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - line 29 * * figures 1,4,5 *