Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936107

EP0936107 - Radiating device for a night vision aid system for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2009Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.08.2009  [2009/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93000 Bobigny / FR
[1999/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Albou, Pierre
16, Rue Boussingault
75013 Paris / FR
[1999/33]
Representative(s)Renous Chan, Véronique
Valeo Vision Département Propriété Industrielle 34 Rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]Renous Chan, Véronique
Valeo Vision, 34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
Former [1999/33]Le Forestier, Eric
Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99400309.310.02.1999
[1999/33]
Priority number, dateFR1998000168412.02.1998         Original published format: FR 9801684
[1999/33]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0936107
Date:18.08.1999
Language:FR
[1999/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936107
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/39]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0936107
Date:26.08.2009
Language:FR
[2009/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/14, F21V9/00
[2002/38]
Former International [1999/33]B60Q1/14, F21Q1/00, F21V9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/17]
Former [1999/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Strahlungsvorrichtung für ein Nachtsicht-Hilfssystem für Kraftfahrzeug[1999/33]
English:Radiating device for a night vision aid system for vehicle[1999/33]
French:Dispositif de rayonnement pour un système d'aide à la vision nocturne pour véhicule[1999/33]
Examination procedure31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
04.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2002Fee for grant paid
27.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.05.2003  16.08.2003  WITHDRAWN
Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH
Tübinger Strasse 123
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate
Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedrichstrasse 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/42]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2003  16.08.2003  WITHDRAWN
Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH
Tübinger Strasse 123
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 6
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2003/30]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2003   
Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH
Tübinger Strasse 123
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 6
70188 Stuttgart / DE
05.06.2003No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
06.06.2003No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
30.07.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.09.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2008
08.09.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.12.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.04.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.07.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2652317  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,12,13 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0455524  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,2,12,13 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 28 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]EP0479634  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,12,13 * column 3, line 18 - line 30 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 39 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4692798  (SEKO YASUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,12,13 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 30 * * column 4, line 57 - line 68 * * column 5, line 1 - line 7 * * figures 1,2,4 *
by applicantFR2705293
OppositionUS5448461