Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033846

EP1033846 - Process for controlling uplink packet transmission in a wireless communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Blanc, Patrick
Alcatel, 10, rue Latécoère
78141 Velizy Cedex / FR
02 / De Montgolfier, Rémi
Alcatel, 10, rue Latécoère
78141 Velizy Cedex / FR
[2000/36]
Representative(s)El Manouni, Josiane , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
Patent Business
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]El Manouni, Josiane , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99400497.601.03.1999
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033846
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/56
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL06.03.2001
LT06.03.2001
LV06.03.2001
MK06.03.2001
RO06.03.2001
SI06.03.2001
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Steuern von Paketübertragung in der Aufwärtsrichtung in einem schnurlosen Kommunikationssystem[2000/36]
English:Process for controlling uplink packet transmission in a wireless communication network[2000/36]
French:Procédé pour contrôler la transmission de données en paquets dans le sens montant dans un système de communication sans fil[2000/36]
Examination procedure25.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/36]
29.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/47]
29.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/47]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.05.2008Request for further processing filed
07.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO9845966  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-4,15,16 * abstract * * page 1, line 8 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 30 * * page 8, line 39 - page 9, line 37 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 2 * * page 16, line 3 - line 21 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 6 * * page 45, line 10 - page 48, line 28 * [A] 6,10,13 [Y] 5,7-9,11,12,14;
 [XAY]WO9507578  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,3,15,16 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 34 * * page 10, line 12 - page 14, line 2 * [A] 2,4,6,7,9,10,13,14 [Y] 5,8,11,12;
 [XAY]US5734646  (I CHIH-LIN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,15,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 25 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 31 * * column 7, line 3 - column 10, line 9 * [A] 2,6,7,10,13,14 [Y] 5,8,9,11,12;
 [YA]EP0765096  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 5,7-9,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 4, line 18 * * column 20, line 30 - column 22, line 52 * [A] 1,6,10;
 [YA]US5574771  (DRIESSEN PETER F [US], et al) [Y] 12,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, line 63 - column 7, line 13 * * column 10, line 43 - column 11, line 10 * [A] 1,13;
 [YA]US5070536  (MAHANY RONALD L [US], et al) [Y] 12,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 25 * * column 5, line 32 - column 8, line 25 * * column 12, line 18 - line 41 * [A] 1,13;
 [YA]US4692945  (ZDUNEK KENNETH J [US]) [Y] 12,14 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 23 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 53 * [A] 1,13