Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992890

EP0992890 - A processor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For:DE  GB  IT  NL  SE 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
13500 North Central Expressway Dallas
Texas 75243 / US
For:FR 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE
821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5
06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For:DE  GB  IT  NL  SE 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75243 / US
For:FR 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE
821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5
06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR
Former [2000/15]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FI  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  AT  CY 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75243 / US
For:FR 
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE
821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5
06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Laurenti, Gilbert
1490 chemin de Saint Etienne
06570 Saint Paul de Vence / FR
02 / Djafarian, Karim
453 boulevard de la Reine Jeanne Les Toscanes
Batiment B1 06140 Vence / FR
03 / Ponsot, Eric
L'Eden de Lacoste
347 route de Cagnes 06140 Vence / FR
04 / Boyodjian, Alain
410 chemin du Puissanton Residence Mediterranee B3
06220 Vallauris / FR
05 / Gillet, Vincent
6 chemin des Moutins
06650 Le Rouret / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99400554.408.03.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateEP1998040245506.10.1998         Original published format: EP 98402455
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992890
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992890
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/32
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Prozessor[2000/15]
English:A processor[2000/15]
French:Processeur[2000/15]
Examination procedure07.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
13.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5485629  (DULONG CAROLE [US]) [A] 1,8,10,16,20,21 * abstract * * column 6, line 61 - column 8, line 20 * * column 13, line 45 - column 15, line 3 * * column 18, line 44 - line 50 *;
 [A]US3979725  (DISPARTE CHARLES P, et al) [A] 1,8,10,16,20,21 * the whole document *
 [A]  "Fast Address Translation in Systems Using Virtual Addresses and a Cache Memory", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (197807), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 663 - 664, XP002131016 [A] 1,8,10,16,20,21 * the whole document *