Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0955314

EP0955314 - Peptide analogues of glucagon-like-peptide-1 (7-37), their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.11.2004  [2004/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
22, rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER
22, rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1 rue Carle Hébert
92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Calas, Bernard
360, rue du Père Prévost
34000 Montpellier / FR
02 / Grassy, Gérard
32, rue Pradas
34470 Perols / FR
03 / Chavanieu, Alain
680, Chemin des Bousquets
34820 Assas / FR
04 / Sarrauste de Menthiere, Cyril
Apt. 5320, 206, rue Fabri de Peiresc
34000 Montpellier / FR
05 / Renard, Pierre
3, avenue du Parc
78150 Le Chesnay / FR
06 / Pfeiffer, Bruno
47, rue Ernest Renan
95320 Saint Leu La Foret / FR
07 / Manechez, Dominique.
16 rue Maxence van der Meersch
59650 Villeneuve D ascq / FR
[1999/49]
Former [1999/45]01 / Calas, Bernard
360, rue du Père Prévost
34000 Montpellier / FR
02 / Grassy, Gérard
32, rue Pradas
34470 Perols / FR
03 / Chavanieu, Alain
680, Chemin des Bousquets
34820 Assas / FR
04 / Sarrauste de Menthiere, Cyril
Apt. 5320, 206, rue Fabri de Peiresc
34000 Montpellier / FR
05 / Renard, Pierre
3, avenue du Parc
78150 Le Chesnay / FR
06 / Pfeiffer, Bruno
47, rue Maxence van der Meersch
59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR
07 / Manechez, Dominique.
16 rue Maxence van der Meersch
59650 Villeneuve D ascq / FR
Application number, filing date99400613.812.03.1999
[1999/45]
Priority number, dateFR1998000455910.04.1998         Original published format: FR 9804559
[1999/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0955314
Date:10.11.1999
Language:FR
[1999/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0955314
Date:29.03.2000
[2000/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0955314
Date:03.12.2003
Language:FR
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/605, A61K38/30
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/45]C07K14/605, A61K38/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
Former [1999/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Peptidanaloge des Glucagon-ähnlichen-Peptids-1 (7-37), deren Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen[2003/29]
English:Peptide analogues of glucagon-like-peptide-1 (7-37), their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions[1999/45]
French:Composés peptidiques analogues du glucagon-like-peptide-1 (7-37), leur procédé de préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent[1999/45]
Former [1999/45]Peptidanaloge des Glucagon-like-Peptide-1 (7-37), deren Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen
Examination procedure31.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/45]
20.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2003Fee for grant paid
28.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO9111457  (BUCKLEY DOUGLAS I [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9,11,14,16,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26;
 [DXY]EP0658568  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9,11,14,16,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26;
 [DXY]EP0733644  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9,11,14,16,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26;
 [Y]WO9325579  (PFIZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9843658  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,5,7,9,11,23-26 * the whole document *
 [Y]  SVETLANA MOJSOV, "STRUCTURAL REQUIREMENTS FOR BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-I", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, (19920901), vol. 40, no. 3 / 04, pages 333 - 343, XP000311244 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [Y]  GEFEL D ET AL, "GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-I ANALOGS: EFFECTS ON INSULIN SECRETION AND ADENOSINE 3',5'-MONOPHOSPHATE FORMATION", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19900401), vol. 126, no. 4, pages 2164 - 2168, XP000574862 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [Y]  SUZUKI S ET AL, "COMPARISON OF THE EFFECTS OF VARIOUS C-TERMINAL AND N-TERMINAL FRAGMENT PEPTIDES OF GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-1 ON INSULIN AND GLUCAGON RELEASE FROM THE ISOLATED PERFUSED RAT PANCREAS", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19891201), vol. 125, no. 6, pages 3109 - 3114, XP000574778 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *