Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974336

EP0974336 - Composition for oxidative dying of keratinous fibres and dying process therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lang, Gérard
51 B, rue Robert Thomas
95390 Saint-Prix / FR
02 / Cotteret, Jean
13, rue du Pré Rousselin
78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Goulard, Sophie
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 6 Rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Goulard, Sophie
L'OREAL-DPI 6 Rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
Former [2000/04]Goulard, Sophie
L'OREAL, DPI, 6, rue Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99401159.111.05.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateFR1998000660426.05.1998         Original published format: FR 9806604
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974336
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974336
Date:08.03.2000
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974336
Date:12.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/13
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Oxidationsfärbungszusammensetzung für keratinische Fäser und Färbungsverfahren mit derselben[2000/04]
English:Composition for oxidative dying of keratinous fibres and dying process therewith[2000/04]
French:Composition de teinture d'oxidation des fibres kératiniques et procédé de teinture mettant en oeuvre cette composition[2000/04]
Examination procedure07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
07.01.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
26.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.07.2001Fee for grant paid
11.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR14.12.2001
LU11.05.2002
MC11.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
[2005/01]
Former [2004/39]LU11.05.2002
MC11.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2004/10]MC11.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2003/25]MC11.05.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US3985499  (LANG GERARD, et al) [X] 1-25 * column W *;
 [X]FR2282860  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0850636  (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0850637  (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0850638  (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *