Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0961302

EP0961302 - Electric coil, transformer, and electric motor having such coil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexans
16, rue de Monceau
75008 Paris / FR
[2001/32]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Decaumont, Anne
17 Chemin de Marcoussis
91180 Saint Germain les Arpajon / FR
02 / Cottevieille, Denis
187 rue de Paris
93100 Montreuil sous Bois / FR
03 / Rieux, Nadine
1 rue des Pinsons
92160 Antony / FR
04 / Foulon, Nadine
12 Square Alain Fournier
75014 Paris / FR
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Feray, Valérie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Former [2001/15]Feray, Valérie , et al
Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Former [1999/48]Buffière, Michelle , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401186.417.05.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateFR1998000664727.05.1998         Original published format: FR 9806647
[1999/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0961302
Date:01.12.1999
Language:FR
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0961302
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/32
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/52]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrische Spule, Transformator, und Elektromotor mit solcher Spule[1999/48]
English:Electric coil, transformer, and electric motor having such coil[1999/48]
French:Bobinage électique, transformateur et moteur électrique comportant un tel bobinage[1999/48]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
12.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4438187  (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0645781  (ALCATEL CABLE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 6, line 23 *;
 [A]DE4218928  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]);
 [A]JPS62260310
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880423), vol. 012, no. 135, Database accession no. (E - 604), [A] * abstract *