Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970635

EP0970635 - Package for a stick shaped composition comprising a mechanism absorbing excess pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gueret, Jean-Louis H.
27 avenue Raymond Poincaré
75016 Paris / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Boulard, Denis
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Boulard, Denis
L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99401454.614.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateFR1998000893610.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808936
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970635
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970635
Date:08.10.2003
Language:FR
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A45D40/04
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verpackung für eine stiftförmige Masse versehen mit einer einen Überdruck absorbierenden Einrichtung[2000/02]
English:Package for a stick shaped composition comprising a mechanism absorbing excess pressure[2000/02]
French:Dispositif pour le conditionnement d'un produit sous forme d'un raisin équipé d'un mécanisme d'absorption de surpression[2000/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
22.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2003Fee for grant paid
31.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.10.2003
[2004/45]
Documents cited:Search[PX]FR2760607  (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1,2,7,8 * column A; figures 1,6 *;
 [A]JPH08214938  ;
 [A]US2704153  (IRVING FLORMAN) [A] 1-3,8,15 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0504050  (EMBALLAGES CONSEILS ETUDES [FR]) [A] 1,4,15 * column 4, line 7 - line 47; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR1193220  (J. MANTELET) [A] 4,5,12,13 * page 3, column L, paragraph 4; figures 3,6 *;
 [A]FR1261214  (L.-P. LEMELAND) [A] 7 * page 1, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5; figure . *;
 [A]JPH0956461  ;
 [A]FR805950  (J.-B. SALARNIER)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 096, no. 012, [A] 1,6,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, [A] 14 * abstract *
ExaminationUS249172