blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973103

EP0973103 - Method and device for controlling the processing of an electronic document [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de traitement d'un document électronique
[2000/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.06.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON EUROPA N.V.
Bovenkerkerweg 59-61
1185 EG Amstelveen / NL
[2008/32]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Canon Europa N.V.
Bovenkerkerweg 59-61
1185 EG Amstelveen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Amarger, Stéphane
34, square de la Mare Pavée
35510 Cession-Sevigne / FR
02 / Henry, Félix
4, Square Albert Gorgiard
35700 Rennes / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Santarelli
Tour Trinity
1 bis Esplanade de la Défense
92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Rinuy, Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date99401479.316.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFR1998000808125.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9808081
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973103
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication
No.:EP0973103
Date:15.03.2000
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973103
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/21
[2008/03]
CPC:
H04N1/40062 (EP,US); G06F40/10 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/03]G06F17/27
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zum Steuern der Verarbeitung eines elektronischen Dokuments[2000/03]
English:Method and device for controlling the processing of an electronic document[2000/11]
French:Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de traitement d'un document électronique[2000/11]
Former [2000/03]Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de traitement d'un document électronique
Former [2000/03]Method and device for controlling the processing of an electronic document
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
06.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2008Fee for grant paid
19.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
20.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
20.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200305   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5767978  (REVANKAR SHRIRAM V [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 41 *;
 [X]US4668995  (CHEN YI-HSIN [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 5, line 57 - column 7, line 6; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5638498  (TYLER WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 33 * * column 11, line 18 - line 45; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5333212  (LIGTENBERG ADRIANUS [US]) [A] 14 * abstract *;
 [A]US4797741  (SATO CHIKARA [JP], et al) [A] 11-13 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.