EP1063861 - Method and apparatus for mobile assisted fault detection in a mobile telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Matra Cellular 1 Place des Frères Montgolfier 78928 Guyancourt Cédex 9 / FR | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Couaillet, Bertrand 12, rue de Belle île F-78310 Maurepas / FR | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goen & Co., Vilvoordsebaan 92 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 99401551.9 | 23.06.1999 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063861 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/34 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Methode und Apparate für Mobilteilnehmer unterstützte Fehlererkennung in einem Mobilfunknetz | [2000/52] | English: | Method and apparatus for mobile assisted fault detection in a mobile telecommunications network | [2000/52] | French: | Méthode et appareils pour mobile aidée la détection de défaut dans un réseau celullaire de télécommunications | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0734193 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-7,9-14,16-18 * page 2, line 36 - line 52 * * page 8, line 46 - page 11, line 29; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0895435 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-6,9-13,16-18 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 36 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 28 *; | [DA]GB2287157 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) [DA] 1,9,16-18 |