blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0971253 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0971253



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 107
18.04.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 1
09.01.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.07.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.08.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
21.07.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 6
15.07.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
07.09.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.08.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 5
27.05.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.05.2004 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
25.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.04.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 8
02.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
17.10.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 9
24.06.1999 Description Search / examination 13
24.06.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Drawings Search / examination 4
24.06.1999 Priority document Search / examination 29
24.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6