Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971253

EP0971253 - Method and apparatus for determining and controlling excess length of a communications element in a conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Draka Comteq B.V.
Boorstraat 2
1021 JZ Amsterdam / NL
[2005/39]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Robinson, Richard T.
1248 Hidden Creek Circle
Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US
02 / Puzan, James J.
209 Glenbrook Lane
Canton, Georgia 30115 / US
[2000/50]
Former [2000/02]01 / Robinson, Richard T.
1248 Hidden Creek Circle
Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US
02 / Puzan, James T.
710 Westre Way
Alpharetta, Georgia 3004 / US
Representative(s)Blokland, Arie
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/43]Blokland, Arie
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau, P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2004/29]Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
Compagnie Financière Alcatel, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 5, rue Noel Pons
92734 Nanterre Cedex / FR
Former [2001/21]Laroche, Danièle , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2000/02]Feray, Valérie , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401570.924.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011142307.07.1998         Original published format: US 111423
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971253
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44, G01B5/06, B29C69/02
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überlängensteuerung eines Kommunikationselementes in einem Rohr[2000/02]
English:Method and apparatus for determining and controlling excess length of a communications element in a conduit[2000/02]
French:Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'une surlongueur pour un élément de communication dans un tube[2000/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
21.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/21]
09.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0286819  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,14 * figure -; claim - * [A] 4-10,12,20,21;
 [A]DE3914014  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,12,16 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4822134  (CAMPBELL BRUCE D [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *