Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969208

EP0969208 - Diaphragm pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMAJE S.A.
9, rue Gaspard Monge, BP 110
26501 Bourg les Valence Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
IMAJE S.A.
9, rue Gaspard Monge, BP 110
26501 Bourg les Valence Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pagnon, Alain
213 rue du Clos de l'Allet
26500 Bourg les Valence / FR
02 / Garcin, Jean Denis
51, avenue Albert Mazade
26250 Livron sur Drome / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/01]Poulin, Gérard
Société de Protection des Inventions Groupe Brevatome, 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401590.725.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateFR1998000822429.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9808224
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969208
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969208
Date:20.10.2004
Language:FR
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:F04B43/06
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Membranpumpe[2000/01]
English:Diaphragm pump[2000/01]
French:Pompe à membrane[2004/22]
Former [2000/01]Pompe a membrane
Examination procedure15.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2004Fee for grant paid
18.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.07.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB25.06.2005
IT25.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
[2007/34]
Former [2006/50]GB25.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
Former [2006/35]GB25.06.2005
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0758053  (MH TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 1; figures 1-5 * * column 7, line 36 - column 7, line 51 * [A] 11;
 [Y]US3387566  (TEMPLE PETER L) [Y] 1,6 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 31 - line 50 * * column 2, line 19 - line 30 *;
 [A]US4372208  (LEGARDINIER ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US4068983  (BALME ROY, et al) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 39 - line 47 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 26 *;
 [A]US3781141  (SCHALL R) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2466640  (ROSER ERICH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *