EP0972509 - Cosmetic composition containing pigments and antiperspirant agents, use of such a composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bazin, Roland 20, Rue du Loup Fendu 91570 Bievres / FR | 02 /
Bara, Isabelle 57, Rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Kromer, Christophe L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Kromer, Christophe L'OREAL - D.P.I., 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/03] | Brédeville, Odile Marie L'Oreal, D.P.I., 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401610.3 | 28.06.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | FR19980009155 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809155 | [2000/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972509 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/02, A61K7/035, A61K7/38 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A61Q1/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/28 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GR, IT [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung enthaltend Pigmente und schweisshemmende Mittel, sowie die Verwendung dieser Zusammensetzung | [2000/17] | English: | Cosmetic composition containing pigments and antiperspirant agents, use of such a composition | [2000/03] | French: | Composition cosmétique comprenant des pigments et un agent anti-transpirant, utilisation d'une telle composition | [2000/03] |
Former [2000/03] | Kosmetisches Zusammensetzung enthaltend eine Pigment und eine scheisshemmende mitteln, sowie die verwendung dieser Zusammensetzung | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2500414 (AE DEV CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,15 * examples 20,24 *; | [X]JPH05112440 ; | [X]US5182103 (NAKANE TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 12; example 27 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930824), vol. 017, no. 462, Database accession no. (C - 1101), & JP05112440 A 19930507 (SAYURI TAKEMOTO) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * |