Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984651

EP0984651 - Method and device for communication on a network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/09]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Morvan, Isabelle
266, rue de Fougères, Apt 64
35700 Rennes / FR
02 / Caillerie, Alain
6, rue François Menez
35700 Rennes / FR
03 / Tocze, Lionel
35 Résidence du Puits Ruellan
35190 St. Domineuc / FR
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Rinuy, Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date99401641.801.07.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateFR1998000962728.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809627
FR1998000962928.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809629
FR1998000963228.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809632
FR1998001047017.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810470
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984651
Date:08.03.2000
Language:FR
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984651
Date:29.11.2000
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984651
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0984651
Date:21.06.2006
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2006/24]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren and Vorrichtung zur Nachrichtenübertragung in einem Netzwerk[2000/10]
English:Method and device for communication on a network[2000/10]
French:Procédé et dispositif de communication sur un réseau[2000/10]
Examination procedure26.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
27.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
17.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M31)
02.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2005Fee for grant paid
21.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06075172.4  / EP1653708
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4935927  (KAEWELL JR JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1,5,21,34,58,63,80,91 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 62 * * column 5, line 1 - line 68 * * figures 8,9,12 *;
 [A]EP0798909  (HAGENUK TELECOM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19645731  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5040205  (KUNIHIRO TAKUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 5 * * column 6, line 16 - line 63 *;
 [A]US5317624  (OBANA NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 29 *;
 [A]WO9603823  (NORAND CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 2 - page 9, line 21 * * page 65, line 1 - page 68, line 22 *;
 [A]EP0766415  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 58,63 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 20 * * column 7, line 14 - column 9, line 52 * * column 12, line 30 - line 53 * * column 13, line 23 - column 14, line 34 *;
 [A]EP0462782  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 58,63 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 9 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0260763  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 58,63 * column 1, line 52 - column 4, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0711057  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 58,63 * page 2, line 7 - line 45 * * page 4, line 23 - line 37 * * page 7, line 33 - line 40 * * page 8, line 8 - line 27 * * page 9, line 10 - line 25 *;
 [A]WO9745994  (TELESTE COMMUNICATION LTD [FI], et al) [A] 58,63 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - line 23 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 24 * * page 11, line 6 - line 21 *;
 [A]US5606560  (MALEK CHARLES J [US], et al) [A] 58,63 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 41 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 13 *