Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973022

EP0973022 - Gyratory shear compacter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratoire Central des Ponts et Chaussées
58 Boulevard Lefèbvre
75732 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
LABORATOIRE CENTRAL DES PONTS ET CHAUSSEES
58 Boulevard Lefèbvre
75732 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Vialletel, Hugues
174 avenue Pasteur
49100 Angers / FR
02 / Gallier, Sylvain
13, Place Sainte Thérèse
49100 Angers / FR
03 / Gaschet, Jacky
34 rue Saumuroise
49250 Corne / FR
04 / Moutier, Francis
21 rue de la Chaussée
44830 Brains / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Le Bras, Hervé , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Le Bras, Hervé , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99401651.702.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFR1998000903615.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809036
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973022
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973022
Date:02.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/28, G01N33/42
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesRO27.06.2000
TitleGerman:Kreiselscherverdichter[2000/03]
English:Gyratory shear compacter[2000/03]
French:Presse à cisaillement giratoire[2002/45]
Former [2000/03]Presse de cisaillement giratoire
Examination procedure27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
31.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.05.2003
IE02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
CY02.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
[2007/04]
Former [2005/02]FI02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
CY02.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
Former [2004/36]FI02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
CY02.07.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
Former [2004/23]FI02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
Former [2004/05]FI02.05.2003
NL02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
Former [2004/02]NL02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE02.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9821558  (BROVOLD THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1,2,10 * pages 9-11; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB911155  (JOHN LEONIDAS MCRAE, et al) [A] 1,6,7 * page 2, line 68 - line 121; figures 1,3 *;
 [AD]US5275056  (HAMILTON EDWARD R [US], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [DA]US5323655  (EAGAN JOHN T [US], et al)